Financial history RESTORATION WORLD REVIVAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1154405
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £247.28k £150.33k £153.33k £24.52k £10.10k
Total expenditure £236.15k £155.82k £156.27k £27.80k £12.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £80.70k £80.70k £20.00k N/A