CHRIST AMBASSADORS MIRACLE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
same as in the original registration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2019
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2014: CIO registration
- CAMC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID KARGBO | Chair | 11 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Howard Ogbonmwan | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2015 | 01/12/2016 | 01/12/2017 | 01/12/2018 | 01/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.03k | £31.72k | £31.72k | £31.15k | £11.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.44k | £29.41k | £28.51k | £29.19k | £10.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 240 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 606 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 606 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 971 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 971 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1336 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1336 days | |
Annual return | 01 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Apr 2014
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION;3.THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS;4.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH:(ATHE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE,DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;(B)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS,CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.5.TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O GATE HOUSE BUILDING
344 OXFORD ROAD
READING
RG30 1AF
- Phone:
- 01189587815
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window