THE FLAG INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Flag Institute is a forum to research a and inform about Vexillology (the Study of Flags). It does this by way of public meetings, scholarly publications and archiving of authoritative flag information from around the world. It helps communities design new flags maintains the UK local flag register and advises HM Government, national and international organizations on flags and flag protocol.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bermuda
- Canada
- Chile
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Hungary
- India
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Jersey
- Luxembourg
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Russia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 19 June 2013: CIO registration
- FI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Revd Canon John Hall | Chair | 01 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Jarratt | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monsieur Roger Ourset | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stephen Tibbetts | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Barbara Ross | Trustee | 28 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM MICHAEL PADRUIG BARTRAM FFI | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.07k | £22.50k | £12.12k | £13.34k | £13.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.14k | £14.15k | £13.16k | £17.45k | £21.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Jun 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF FLAGS AND VEXILLOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 Norwood Grove
BEVERLEY
HU17 9HS
- Phone:
- 07531266713
- Email:
- info@flaginstitute.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window