LS29 SPECIAL NEEDS SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of children with special needs & their families, in the LS29 area and the surrounds by: 1. the provision of recreational and leisure time activities, respite care, help, information and support; 2. increasing public awareness of the problems and circumstances of people with special needs; 3. encouraging inclusion of children with special needs in the wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 05 July 2013: Standard registration
- 18 September 2024: Funds received from 513796 ILKLEY TALKING NEWSPAPER
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN GOODMAN-PICKEN | Chair | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elliott | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Tanya Young | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Diane Fielding | Trustee | 10 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA STREET | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|||||
NICOLA SCOURFIELD | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.94k | £82.67k | £118.43k | £113.37k | £51.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.81k | £83.10k | £101.23k | £112.90k | £40.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £28.34k | £44.24k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 2013 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN THE LS29 POSTCODE AREA AND THE SURROUNDS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, RESPITE CARE, HELP, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT; 2. INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE PROBLEMS AND CIRCUMSTANCES OF PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS; 3. ENCOURAGING INCLUSION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Westville Avenue
Ilkley
LS29 9AH
- Phone:
- 01943 609861
- Email:
- ls29groups@yahoo.couk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window