POWYS COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
First Responders have attended numerous callouts for the Welsh Ambulance Service in this reporting period. Responders have been to 6 patients experiencing Sudden Cardiac Arrest and many others that needed emergency help. The team has been out in the community training members of the public in CPR and Defibrillator use. We continue to fundraise in order to update our equipment as necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 01 August 2013: Standard registration
- 09 May 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 June 2017: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharlene Dunn | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAJ EDDIE MAHONY MBE | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/11/2019 | 27/11/2020 | 27/11/2021 | 27/11/2022 | 27/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.57k | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £820 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.35k | £633 | £149 | £432 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 November 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 November 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 November 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 November 2020 | 16 October 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 November 2019 | 11 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/2013
Charitable objects
1)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH TO THE PEOPLE AT LARGE WITHIN WALES BY PROVIDING TRAINED VOLUNTEERS TO ATTEND MEDICAL EMERGENCIES AS DIRECTED BY THE WELSH AMBULANCE SERVICE. 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF BASIC LIFE SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Gwyn
Llanwern
BRECON
LD3 7UW
- Phone:
- 07887717522
- Email:
- spcfrcoord@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window