THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, UPPER TOOTING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ANGLICAN CHURCH OFFERING A RANGE OF SERVICES OVER THE COURSE OF THE YEAR THAT THE COMMUNITY FIND BOTH BENEFICIAL AND SPIRITUALLY FULFILLING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 29 May 2013: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY (UPPER TOOTING) PCC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Angela Claire Rayner | Chair | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tung Ngoc To | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ethan Glackin-McColgan | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Reyneke | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Russ Snapp | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Whitehouse KC | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Judson Jones | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Judith Anne Coles | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ben Sherwood | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
FERELITH MARGARET HORDON | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|||||
EMMANUEL CLAUDE BOUYER | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|||||
YVONNE PANTON | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE HARRISON | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|||||
JULIAN ROBERT WARE | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|||||
JEAN FERRIER COOPER | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE ALLAN | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MAY | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE MILLIGAN | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £270.24k | £217.98k | £189.15k | £241.21k | £261.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £347.88k | £378.50k | £149.57k | £185.37k | £188.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20A ROMBERG ROAD
TOOTING BEC
LONDON
SW17 8UA
- Phone:
- 02076066145
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window