Financial history THE AUSTRALIA DAY FOUNDATION UK TRUST

Charity number: 1153770
Charity reporting is up to date (189 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.24k £1.77k £498 £378 £378
Total expenditure £1.80k £33.93k £1.40k £11.34k £11.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A