THE AUSTRALIA DAY FOUNDATION UK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Australia Day Foundation UK Trust's objectives are for the public benefit to promote the education, including the social and physical training, of young Australian citizens who are living or working in, or visiting the United Kingdom by awarding financial assistance in the form of allowances and grants tenable at any university, college of institution of higher or further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 September 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Christopher Hickey | Chair | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Mulley | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Donald Low | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD BRUCE PORTER | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bronwyn Curtis OBE | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £1.77k | £498 | £378 | £378 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £33.93k | £1.40k | £11.34k | £11.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 February 2025 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 165 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 December 2022 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 December 2022 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 Sep 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING THE SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING, OF YOUNG AUSTRALIAN CITIZENS WHO ARE LIVING OR WORKING IN, OR VISITING, THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (1) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN THE FORM OF ALLOWANCES AND GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; (2) ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE OR SCIENCE), OR ASSISTING THEM TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, BUSINESS, TRADE OR PROFESSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE AUSTRALIAN CENTRE
STRAND
LONDON
WC2B 4LG
- Phone:
- 02075209100
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window