Accounts and annual returns LEEK TOWN JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1153767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 20 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 June 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 June 2024 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 31 October 2023 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 May 2022 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required