Financial history LEEK TOWN JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1153767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.35k £2.03k £2.36k £66.57k £91.05k
Total expenditure £4.93k £1.67k £4.21k £64.48k £84.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A