Accounts and annual returns PARWAZ PHILANTHROPY

Charity number: 1155321
Charity reporting is overdue by 1507 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 46 days
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 46 days
Annual return 25 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 411 days
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 411 days
Annual return 25 May 2022 12 February 2024 324 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 777 days
Annual return 25 May 2021 12 February 2024 689 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1142 days
Annual return 25 May 2020 12 February 2024 1054 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1507 days