THE FAIRLIGHT ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1152543
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help raise the profile of Hastings as a centre for internationally acclaimed public art for the benefit of the town and its residents.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022

Total income: £42,000
Total expenditure: £33,532

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 2013: Standard registration
  • 29 November 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 29 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1170498 FAIRLIGHT HALL RIDING FOR THE DISABLED
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £39.00k £52.00k £8.00k £18.50k £42.00k
Total expenditure £36.06k £49.93k £6.93k £22.36k £33.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window