TABERNACLE, MORRISTON CONGREGATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We continued to work to advance Christian Worship for the benefit of the public in accordance with Biblical Teachings and in the tradition of the Welsh Non Conformists. We held regular weekly services and additional activities. We continue to work with CADW to secure the future of the Grade listed building in which we worship.We supported other charities and voluntary bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 27 June 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Jenkins | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN ROBERTS | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr BETSAN ROSSER | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|||||
MALVINA LEY | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Rhian Elizabeth WILLIAMS | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|||||
HUW TREGELLES WILLIAMS | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|||||
CARYS ANN JENKINS | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|||||
PAMELA JOHN | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS OSWALD MURPHY | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GWYN MORGAN | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LLOYD EVANS | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GARETH EVANS MBE | Trustee | 05 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.02k | £25.37k | £26.71k | £27.06k | £30.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.08k | £27.23k | £29.97k | £30.73k | £28.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 December 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 December 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Jun 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ACCEPTED TEACHINGS OF THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS OF THE BIBLE IN THE INDEPENDENT WELSH NON-CONFORMIST TRADITION INCLUDING THE ORGANISATION OF SERVICES OF PUBLIC WORSHIP OF GOD, PREACHING OF THE GOSPELS OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST, PRAYER MEETINGS, BIBLE STUDY GROUPS, OTHER EVANGELISTIC TEACHING OR OUTREACH EVENTS AND THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN FESTIVALS AND CEREMONIES; AND (B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE MEMBERS FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.(THE 'OBJECTS')
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 MAES-Y-COED
MORRISTON
SWANSEA
SA6 6DS
- Phone:
- 01792 773507
- Email:
- dgjohn@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window