Financial history Liquid Listening

Charity number: 1154224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £12.49k £28.47k £86.89k £102.78k £90.19k
Total expenditure £12.82k £12.96k £55.85k £78.77k £96.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £10.72k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.80k