Liquid Listening

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Liquid Listening aims to increase the well being of disabled children, young people and adults, and explore ways to promote their education and health, increased awareness and meaningful involvement with their environment. We do this by providing underwater listening sessions for children with special and complex needs, creative music-making activities and training for their teachers and carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £2,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 October 2013: Standard registration
- Liquid Listening (Working name)
- LIQUID VIBRATIONS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Frank Lush | Chair | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Marina Bujic | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Tyson | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Crust | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Fairbairn Chapman | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Smith | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Graham Bettridge | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.49k | £28.47k | £86.89k | £102.78k | £90.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.82k | £12.96k | £55.85k | £78.77k | £96.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.72k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 JUL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/09/2013 as amended on 27 Feb 2023 as amended on 31 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
1. The advancement of education of disabled children and adults and children and adults with special needs in the arts and in particular the art of music and through the use of new technology and new ways of experiencing music and musical vibrations. 2. The advancement of education through the promotion of research into the educational and therapeutic use of the arts and in particular the art of music for the benefit of disabled children and adults and the publication of the useful results of such research for the public benefit. 3. The relief of need and sickness and the promotion of health and wellbeing primarily but not exclusively for children and adults with special needs and disabilities, through the medium of underwater music and vibrations.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bettridge & Co Accountants
28 Broad Street
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG40 1AB
- Phone:
- 07903 369903
- Email:
- judith@liquidlistening.org
- Website:
-
liquidlistening.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window