Financial history KENT FRIENDZ

Charity Number: 1152617
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £331.96k £362.44k £356.09k £536.99k £580.09k
Total expenditure £317.32k £361.91k £355.75k £534.43k £629.65k
Income from government contracts N/A £105.00k £103.52k £272.75k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £30.67k £0 £300.07k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £122.43k £412.80k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £76
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £412.33k £164.73k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.24k £2.49k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £468.80k £593.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £25.77k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £39.86k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £36.12k