MANCHESTER JEWISH MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The museum preserves and promotes Manchester?s rich and diverse Jewish heritage. Its permanent gallery tells the story of the Jewish community from the 1740s to 1945. Formal and informal learning sessions are regularly held inside the museum as are exhibitions and events, helping to promote tolerance and understanding of Jewish faith, heritage and culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £61,989 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
Governance
- 28 October 2013: Standard registration
- 22 April 2015: Funds received from 508278 MANCHESTER JEWISH MUSEUM
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Chapman QC | Chair | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Clement Goldstone | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Michael Blakey | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Anne McNally | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Scorah | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hirst | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Bolton | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gideon Leventhall | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Redston | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jenkins | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Vivien Birchall | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mark Shapiro | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.80m | £2.78m | £618.92k | £642.15k | £491.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £362.23k | £333.59k | £897.58k | £823.91k | £768.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.00k | £51.00k | £76.12k | £51.30k | £61.99k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.78m | £2.76m | £451.03k | £528.13k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £4.74k | £4.21k | £52.65k | £48.27k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.07k | £432 | £63.54k | £65.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.99k | £1.16k | £14 | £209 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £11.95k | £6.45k | £51.69k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.75k | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £321.45k | £303.07k | £798.47k | £782.96k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £40.78k | £30.52k | £99.10k | £40.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.25k | £6.37k | £6.58k | £6.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £304 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/09/2013 as amended on 29 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
To advance education for the public benefit by managing and maintaining a museum collection and historic synagogue and by bringing together people of all ages, faiths and backgrounds to share stories of Jewish Manchester and other faiths in order to promote tolerance and a culturally diverse society for the benefit of the public.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANCHESTER JEWISH MUSEUM
190 CHEETHAM HILL ROAD
MANCHESTER
M8 8LW
- Phone:
- 01618349879
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window