Accounts and annual returns L.E.A.D. TRUST

Charity number: 1153236
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 July 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 May 2017 On Time