L.E.A.D. TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The subsidiary company the L.E.A.D. Multi Academy Trust currently consists of the following schools located in Nottinghamshire and Leicestershire providign the education for 2.500 children; Huntingdon Academy, Warren Academy, Edna G Olds Academy, Sycamore Academy, Hogarth Academy, Windmill L.E.A.D. Academy, Millfield L.E.A.D. Academy,St Ann's Well Academy and Bishop Alexander L.E.A.D. Academy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Leicester City
- Manchester City
- Northamptonshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Sheffield City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 August 2013: Standard registration
- 23 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- L.E.A.D. ACADEMY TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.88m | £25.28m | £21.75m | £37.87m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.38m | £19.77m | £21.54m | £41.88m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.55m | £21.03m | £36.44m | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £14.88m | £4.67m | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £196.00k | £1.06m | £0 | £1.41m | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £13.38m | £19.55m | £0 | £36.41m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.00k | £4.00k | £0 | £4.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £418.00k | £0 | £21.03m | £40.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.19m | £18.49m | £21.54m | £40.08m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.76m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £102.00k | £159.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £40.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 06 July 2019 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 29 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2017
(These accounts |
29 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 30 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
30 May 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/09/2011 as amended on 17 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUST'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") SHALL BE TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING AND/OR SUPPORTING, (WHETHER FINANCIALLY, BY PROVIDING SERVICES AND FACILITIES OR OTHERWISE) COMPANIES, TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS FOR THE PURPOSE OF SPONSORING, CO-SPONSORING, ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING ONE OR MORE SCHOOLS ("ACADEMIES")
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window