SIERRA FOUNDATION FOR LIFE SKILLS (SFFLS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing resources for the advancement of education and training in Sierra Leone, particularly females facing social exclusion. Supporting the relief of poverty in Sierra Leone, and providing relief to families suffering from the aftermath of the Ebola crisis. The Charity built a bakery to provide affordable nutritious food for a local community near Freetown during this period.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 03 June 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Nuttall | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wilson Monro | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Clive Wayne Devonish | Trustee | 31 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Verity Lowe | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Wolton | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|||||
SANDRA ANN LLOYD NNEB | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/07/2020 | 26/07/2021 | 26/07/2022 | 26/07/2023 | 26/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.37k | £20.61k | £15.93k | £18.29k | £26.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.98k | £18.12k | £14.45k | £24.73k | £19.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 July 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 July 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 July 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Jun 2014
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN SIERRA LEONE, IN PARTICULAR FOR FEMALES WHO FACE SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; AND FOR REFUGEES AND YOUNG OFFENDERS. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SIERRA LEONE, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING THE ABOVE MENTIONED PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BECOME SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SIERRA LEONE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 FAIRVIEW DRIVE
BAYSTON HILL
SHREWSBURY
SY3 0LD
- Phone:
- 01743874445
- Email:
- veritylowe@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
sffls.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window