THE THOMAS AND ROSEMARY GREENHALGH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1153085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

makes grants guided by a letter of wishes made by Rosemary Greenhalgh - favouring The Girl Guide Movement, grants for educational purposes (eg higher education), and Mount Pleasant Baptist Church, Northampton

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £36,086
Total expenditure: £41,186

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Virginia Anne Henley Chair 15 July 2021
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
Susan Elizabeth Alcock Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
Mr R P Hampson Trustee 22 November 2013
None on record
KEITH THOMAS DAVIDSON Trustee 12 July 2013
THE MANNA HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £37.79k £32.32k £29.75k £34.10k £36.09k
Total expenditure £46.35k £41.43k £36.29k £42.54k £41.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HCR Hewitsons
Lancaster House
Nunn Mills Road
Northampton
Northamptonshire
NN1 5GE
Phone:
01604233233
Website:

No information available