STAR TRUST (EAST MIDLANDS) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Star Trust is an East Midlands-based charity, run by local business owners and entrepreneurs, which supports good causes across the region. Using our members' business expertise and commercial initiative, we hold events throughout the year to raise money for locally-run charities that can often struggle to secure public donations, simply because they lack the profile of national organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 24 September 2013: Standard registration
- THE STAR TRUST (Working name)
- STAR TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Cawdron | Trustee | 23 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVE WARREN | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN HAMPSON | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.14k | £102.26k | £39.56k | £105.53k | £182.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.32k | £132.59k | £38.35k | £69.29k | £167.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/09/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Harlaxton Estates Ltd
Windsor House
Long Bennington Business Park
Long Bennington
Newark
Nottingh
- Phone:
- 01400283224
- Email:
- enquiries@star-trust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window