Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, HECKMONDWIKE WITH ALL SOULS, NORRISTHORPE
Charity number: 1152319

Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Melusi Sibanda | Chair | 23 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Porritt | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Waldron | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Christopher Firth | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Brooke | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Firth | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Stocks | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brook Carbutt | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan King | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Newham | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suzanna Elaine Boon | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Thompson | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|||||
MRS Val Ellis | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Bathgate | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Caroline Wai Yeng Waring | Trustee | 28 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MARGARET BRITTON | Trustee | 02 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WALKER | Trustee | 02 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.