AF&V LAUNCHPAD LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AF&V LAUNCHPAD'S PURPOSE IS TO REDUCE THE INCIDENCE OF HOMELESSNESS, UNEMPLOYMENT AND SOCIAL DEPRIVATION AMONG VETERANS BY PROVIDING RENTED ACCOMMODATION IN A SINGLE SITE, SPEKE HOUSE IN LIVERPOOL AND AVONDALE HOUSE IN NEWCASTLE. ONCE HOUSED, LAUNCHPAD ENCOURAGES VETERANS TO ENGAGE THE NUMEROUS ORGANISATIONS THAT OFFER HELP WITH TRAINING, SEEKING EMPLOYMENT AND FINDING PERMANENT ACCOMMODATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,655,221
Donations and legacies | £659.42k | |
Charitable activities | £975.07k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £15.21k | |
Other | £5.52k |
Total expenditure:
£1,589,384
Raising funds | £95.36k | |
Charitable activities | £1.49m | |
Other | £639 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £96.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.49m | |
Retained for future use | £65.84k |
People

24 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Liverpool City
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 01 August 2013: Standard registration
- AF&V LAUNCHPAD LTD (Working name)
- ARMED FORCES & VETERANS LAUNCHPAD LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucinda Claire Perriam | Chair | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Aaron Sahota | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Christine Smith | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Katherine McGough | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
IAN GARETH DORMER | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Brigadier - Retired Paul Joseph Andrew Baker OBE | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Sarah-Louise McCartney | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Colonel Retired Mark Charles Heath Underhill OBE DL | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
RICHARD ADRIAN DIXON-WARREN | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
MAJOR KENNETH JAMES MCMILLAN MBE | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06m | £996.00k | £1.05m | £1.27m | £1.66m | |
|
Total expenditure | £889.86k | £872.54k | £990.18k | £1.29m | £1.59m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £476.27k | £447.09k | £442.61k | £473.00k | £659.42k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £573.22k | £539.11k | £597.41k | £773.65k | £975.07k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.79k | £3.00k | £3.70k | £10.36k | £15.21k | |
|
Income - Other | £4.00k | £6.79k | £9.55k | £15.87k | £5.52k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £889.86k | £872.54k | £990.18k | £1.21m | £1.49m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £73.81k | £95.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £61.48k | £3.30k | £4.39k | £13.50k | £26.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £639 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £779.92k | £748.67k | £1.11m | £1.08m | £1.04m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £509.99k | £674.50k | £653.41k | £666.31k | £774.85k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £44.53k | £54.32k | £335.17k | £327.96k | £337.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 JUL 2016 as amended on 20 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST SERVICE PERSONNEL AND ARMED FORCES VETERANS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS (INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE SERVING MEMBERS THAT ARE ABOUT TO LEAVE, AND THOSE WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES AND HAVE ALREADY LEFT) BY THE PROVISION OF HOUSING AND ACCOMMODATION, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO HELP THEM RESETTLE INTO CIVILIAN LIFE. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING THE BENEFICIARIES IDENTIFIED IN THE OBJECT FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ?SOCIALLY EXCLUDED? MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; INSTITUTIONALISATION; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN OR REJECTION; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Taigh-Aighearach
Tayvallich
LOCHGILPHEAD
PA31 8PW
- Phone:
- 03001111238
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window