MAA AUR BACHA

Charity number: 1154878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

courses support group trips awareness programmes sporting activities coffee mornings fundraising events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,266
Total expenditure: £872

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FEHMIDA MOTALA Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
RASHIDA QURESHI Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
MEHRUNNISA TUTLA Trustee 29 October 2015
None on record
SHABNUM DAWJEE Trustee 03 July 2013
None on record
FATIMA MULLA Trustee 03 July 2013
None on record
NURJHAN AMLA Trustee 03 July 2013
None on record
SAMIM ROKAD Trustee 29 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.84k £10.33k £8.03k £1.79k £1.27k
Total expenditure £1.56k £7.23k £6.24k £1.46k £872
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 April 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 April 2024 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 April 2024 802 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2024 1167 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Clifton Crescent
Preston
PR1 6YL
Phone:
01772795885
Website:

No information available