IBTC PORTSMOUTH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training in the skills and knowledge required to build, restore, repair, conserve and use traditional boats and ships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 June 2013: Standard registration
- 14 July 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 July 2020: Funds transferred to 293188 Portsmouth Historic Quarter Trust
- INTERNATIONAL BOATBUILDING TRAINING COLLEGE, PORTSMOUTH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.01k | £100.61k | £370.76k | £820.81k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.25k | £138.74k | £466.93k | £810.95k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £60.75k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £757.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £783.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.27k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 27 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 15 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 15 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 23 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 23 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF IBTC ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, ARTS, CULTURE, SCIENCE AND HERITAGE BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS REQUIRED TO BUILD, CONSERVE, RESTORE AND REPAIR AND USE HERITAGE VESSELS AND VESSELS USING TRADITIONAL MATERIALS OR DESIGN AND OTHER HERITAGE ASSETS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window