Financial history WOMBWELL MAIN COMMUNITY AND SPORTING ASSOCIATION C.I.O

Charity number: 1153248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £288.88k £159.40k £429.62k £377.48k £371.83k
Total expenditure £257.17k £159.42k £332.48k £372.37k £369.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.45k £74.39k £129.35k £10.00k £6.77k