Accounts and annual returns STRATHAVEN ASTHMATIC RELIEF ACTION UK

Charity Number: 1159285
Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 27 December 2024 326 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 27 December 2024 326 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 May 2022 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 17 May 2022 101 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 May 2022 466 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 17 May 2022 466 days late Download Open in new window