THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE STUDENTS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the welfare and interests of the Students of the Royal Veterinary College; Representing the student body to external bodies and to the management and Council of the Royal Veterinary College Encouraging the personal development of the Students of the Royal Veterinary College through providing social, cultural, educational and recreational activities organised in clubs and societies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£1,017,122
Donations and legacies | £536.44k | |
Charitable activities | £440.93k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £39.76k |
Total expenditure:
£1,049,117
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.05m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.05m |
People

2 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 22 July 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ceri Marie Chick | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ioulia Kaloudi | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Jones | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheuk Yan Man | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Alexander Alvarez | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Molly Drennan | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bibi Fatima Tuken Tegi | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erica Oliver | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Irene Cooper | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anju Frances Loveridge | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Portia Nicholas-Jago | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Smith | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Murphy | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ezrie Prideaux | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £796.74k | £557.12k | £722.41k | £831.94k | £1.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £774.65k | £507.72k | £725.00k | £867.23k | £1.05m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £462.21k | £430.28k | £492.23k | £518.24k | £536.44k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £195.00k | £312.90k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £245.08k | £120.59k | £722.41k | £831.94k | £440.93k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £16.60k | £6.25k | £35.40k | £808 | £39.76k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £774.65k | £507.72k | £725.00k | £867.23k | £1.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.12k | £6.65k | £0 | £0 | £14.87k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £152.31k | £183.63k | £177.97k | £158.96k | £149.12k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £45.32k | £25.76k | £0 | £0 | £37.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 June 2021 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Jul 2013 as amended on 02 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE UNION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY: (A) PROMOTING THE WELFARE AND INTERESTS OF THE STUDENTS OF THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE; (B) REPRESENTING THE STUDENT BODY OF THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE TO EXTERNAL BODIES AND TO THE MANAGEMENT, COMMITTEES AND COUNCIL OF THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE; AND (C) ENCOURAGING THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE STUDENTS OF THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE THROUGH PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES ORGANIZED IN CLUBS, SOCIETIES AND DISCUSSION GROUPS AND THROUGH DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING APPROPRIATE FACILITIES TO ACCOMMODATE SUCH ACTIVITIES. THE UNION WILL SEEK AT ALL TIMES TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT DIVERSITY IN THE STUDENT BODY THROUGH ENSURING THE UNION?S DECISION MAKING AND SERVICE PROVISION ARE SOLELY TO ADVANCE THE ABOVE OBJECTS, AND ARE MADE INDEPENDENTLY AND WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION WITH REGARD TO AGE, GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RELIGIOUS BELIEFS, DISABILITY, MEDICAL CONDITIONS, OR POLITICAL BELIEFS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RVCSU
Hawkshead Lane
North Mymms
North Mymms
Herts
AL9 7TA
- Phone:
- 01707666333
- Email:
- sustaff@rvc.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window