Financial history YELLOW DOG UK

Charity Number: 1153038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £29.79k £49.21k £95.04k £103.33k £86.62k
Total expenditure £33.71k £45.30k £92.30k £96.47k £87.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A