Trustees MOE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1156279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Coops Chair 30 January 2014
None on record
Richard Daley Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
Miroslava Robson Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Nicolas Robson Trustee 23 August 2023
None on record
Steffen Staeuber Trustee 14 December 2016
None on record