THE CHARTERED SECRETARIES' CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Chartered Secretaries' Charitable Trust serves The Chartered Governance Institute UK & Ireland members, graduates, students, employees and their families who are in need by providing appropriate assistance, facilitates research to increase good governance for the benefit of the public and encourages the expertise of those in the field of governance with bursaries and prizes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- France
- India
- Ireland
- Kenya
- Malaysia
- Mauritius
- Namibia
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Sri Lanka
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 26 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR F E CURTISS FCG FCMA | Chair | 09 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Victoria Margaret Penrice FCG | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek John Lewis LLB FCG | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Claire Louise Robson FCG | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR A P THEAKSTON FCG | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|||||
MR I J BURGER FCG | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR R J C GRIGG FCG | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.15k | £35.60k | £6.55k | £180.46k | £290.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.49k | £240.23k | £304.66k | £205.90k | £242.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/2013 as amended on 12 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
4. OBJECTS The Objects are specifically restricted to the following, for the public benefit: 4.1 To help individuals who are in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage, in particular but not exclusively by providing financial assistance, services or by any other means as determined by trustees from time to time, to help relieve their need and promote their physical and mental wellbeing who:: 4.1.1 are or have been members of The Chartered Governance Institute (the “Institute”) (such members being those who are or who have been at any time on the register or registers of the Institute for the United Kingdom, Channel Islands, Isle of Man, Republic of Ireland and Associated Territories) or of any other United Kingdom body which has merged or amalgamated or integrated with the Institute; 4.1.2 are graduates, students, employees or former employees of the Institute; 4.1.3 are widows, widowers, surviving civil partners, issue or other dependants of such members, graduates, students, employees or former employees of the Institute; or 4.1.4 are or have been in receipt of assistance from the Fund at 17 December 1992. 4.2 To promote the education of the public in the law and practice of secretaryship, business administration of commerce, industry and public affairs and subjects related thereto, and in particular but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing by providing prizes and awards to such persons who attain the required excellence of performance at public examinations in approved subjects within the curriculum of the Institute as agreed from time to time. 4.3 To advance the education of the public in the law and practice of secretaryship and business administration by undertaking or assisting in the undertaking of research and the publication of the useful results of such research for the public benefit and by such other means as the trustees think fit.
Linked charities
- 26 October 1993 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Saffron House
6-10 Kirby Street
London
EC1N 8TS
- Phone:
- 020 7612 7049
- Email:
- CSCT@cgi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window