Financial history My Respite Care

Charity number: 1152941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £62.17k £191.53k £212.84k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £54.00k £232.21k £179.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £27.83k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.48k