Trustees PORTUGUESE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1157249

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carla Sofia Araujo Ribeiro | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Flavio Serra | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Da Conceicao Mano Ferreira | Trustee | 14 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Conceicao Bruno | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Salome Tomaz dos Santos | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.