Financial history KIDS ZONE (HACKNEY)

Charity Number: 1153024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £326.28k £320.90k £366.01k £356.12k £457.15k
Total expenditure £302.40k £337.42k £365.16k £362.93k £429.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £107.23k
Income from government grants N/A £87.19k N/A £123.29k N/A