Accounts and annual returns THE JOHNSON NDJOLI MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154747
Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 April 2021 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required