HAY AND DISTRICT DIAL-A-RIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hay and District Dial-a-Ride provides community transport services for members in a 9 mile radius of Hay-on-Wye who are need of such a service. All of our drivers are volunteers and we own two vehicles: an 11 seater minibus and a 5 seater MPV. We also operate a Community Car Scheme to enable individual members to book longer specific journeys.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £32,969 from 7 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
- Powys
Governance
- 02 July 2013: Standard registration
- HAY DIAL-A-RIDE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY LESLEY FELLOWES | Chair | 14 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Helen Frances Rinaldi | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Boughey | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Joseph Powell | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hughes | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Mary Tong | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Gardiner | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.65k | £64.33k | £106.45k | £101.46k | £97.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.81k | £61.57k | £71.46k | £86.90k | £88.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.59k | £27.27k | £24.67k | £23.15k | £32.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/04/2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN THE HAY-ON-WYE AND DISTRICT AREA WHO ARE POOR, DISABLED, ELDERLY OR WHO OTHERWISE HAVE IMPAIRED MOBILITY BY THE PROVISION OF A TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
HAY-ON-WYE AND DISTRICT AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Castle Street
Hay-on-Wye
HEREFORD
HR3 5DF
- Phone:
- 01497821616
- Email:
- HAYDIALARIDE@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
haydialaride.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window