HREOD BURNA URBAN FOREST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have planted 1500 tree whips and intend to plant another 8000 and clear paths in the area of Hreod Burna Urban Forest. We lease our land from Central Swindon North Parish Council. We planted approx 2,000 trees 2019/2020, and are now concentrating on planting a Miyawaki Forest this autumn/winter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Swindon
Governance
- 03 February 2014: CIO registration
- HBUF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Bentley | Chair | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GWINNELL | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Flora mirian Wilkins | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary philomena Farragher | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Ballman | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|||||
KATHARINE ALISON HENERY | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN THOMPSON | Trustee | 15 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2019 | 01/07/2020 | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2022 | 01/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.01k | £2.64k | £304 | £250 | £242 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £3.99k | £8.41k | £1.75k | £2.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £410 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days | |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 28 July 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | 28 July 2024 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 08 May 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | 08 May 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Feb 2014 as amended on 10 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GORSE HILL, PINEHURST AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROVISION OF WOODLANDS AS A PUBLIC AMENITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 NORMAN ROAD
SWINDON
SN2 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01793535185
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
hreodburnaurbanforest.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window