ST FRANCIS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to further or benefit primarily those residing in or near Bournville without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or political, religious or other opinions to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for residents and particularly for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 05 June 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alistair McIntosh | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Richard Malcolm Wharton | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Ravinder Sangha | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Allan Laughton Wilford | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Pickup | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
TESSA MITCHELL | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|||||
PATRICK EDWIN PENROSE | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM GEORGE RICE | Trustee | 25 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.33k | £171.49k | £210.14k | £239.48k | £227.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.69k | £175.31k | £185.31k | £191.51k | £227.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £69.02k | £3.61k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 DEC 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT PRIMARILY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THOSE RESIDING IN OR NEAR THE PARISH OF ST FRANCIS, BOURNVILLE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS AND PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) FOR YOUNG PEOPLE.
Linked charities
- 05 June 1974 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. FRANCIS YOUTH CLUB
SYCAMORE ROAD
BOURNVILLE
BIRMINGHAM
B30 2AA
- Phone:
- 01214727215
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window