Financial history HALIFAX BIBLE BELIEVERS FELLOWSHIP

Charity Number: 1152719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £210.97k £262.13k £215.28k £355.98k £277.89k
Total expenditure £71.11k £147.60k £141.98k £229.64k £216.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A