WHITLEY BAY FC ACADEMY JUNIORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COMMUNITY FOOTBALL , SPORTS AND ACTIVITIES FOR ALL AGES AND ETHNIC GROUPS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 29 October 2013: Standard registration
- 25 January 2019: Funds received from 1130615 WHITLEY BAY FC WOMEN
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE BAXTER | Chair | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MCILDUFF | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA GLADSTONE | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.98k | £61.55k | £64.88k | £51.27k | £70.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.34k | £34.73k | £60.60k | £66.44k | £32.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2025 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2025 | 346 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2022
(These accounts |
06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 250 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 250 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH TYNESIDE AND SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL AND ASSOCIATED TRAINING. TO ADVANCE THE HEALTHY RECREATION AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 5 AND 25 AND LIVING IN NORTH TYNESIDE AND SURROUNDING AREA BY ENCOURAGING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOXHUNTERS PITCHES
PRESTON GATE
NORTH SHIELDS
NE29 9QB
- Phone:
- 01912518353
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window