CENTRE FOR HEALTH AND THE PUBLIC INTEREST (CHPI)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objects The objects of CHPI as set-out in the objects of the company articles of association are: to advance the education of the public in health and social care policies and to promote informed debate and research for the public benefit in all aspects of that subject and to publish the useful results.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2014: Standard registration
- CHPI (Working name)
- CENTRE FOR HEALTH AND THE PUBLIC INTEREST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Herbert Evans | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Emma Jayne Watkins | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Lois Rogers | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Charteris | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathon Tomlinson | Trustee | 10 April 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.37k | £118.12k | £146.99k | £139.24k | £116.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.26k | £85.44k | £110.09k | £142.85k | £133.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/05/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE POLICIES AND TO PROMOTE INFORMED DEBATE AND RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pelican House
148 Cambridge Heath Road
LONDON
E1 5QJ
- Phone:
- 020 7324 4624
- Email:
- info@chpi.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window