THE FRIENDS OF DEBDALE PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Debdale Park is located in the Gorton area of East Manchester. The Friends of the park are an umbrella organisation of the various social projects located in the park who also support the park, working in conjunction with Manchester City Council, to maintain and develop its infrastructure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,585 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Manchester City
Governance
- 17 October 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLAN GRAFTON JP, MBE | Chair | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Irene Hargreaves | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Norton | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Rees | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Kennedy | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Grafton | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fred Taylor | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Ballard | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olwyn Taylor | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Stevenson | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.75k | £2.75k | £11.21k | £19.82k | £1.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.90k | £1.20k | £11.89k | £15.82k | £5.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.15k | £1.00k | £7.30k | £1.60k | £1.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF DEBDALE PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1075 Hyde Road
Gorton
Manchester
M18 7LJ
- Phone:
- 01612230272
- Email:
- allangrafton@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window