Accounts and annual returns EALING CHURCHES WINTER NIGHT SHELTER

Charity number: 1152768
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 28 March 2025 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 28 March 2025 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 14 March 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 14 March 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 11 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 09 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 09 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 11 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window