EXETER-ETHIOPIA LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exeter-Ethiopia Link was set up in 1987 to promote a community link between the people of Exeter and the people of Nekemte, the principal town in the region of Wollega, Ethiopia. The charity supports projects related to health, water, education, the environment, women and disabled people in Nekemte and surrounding areas. It also provides information to the people of Exeter on life in Ethiopia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 04 October 2013: CIO registration
- 21 November 2014: Funds received from 1000293 EXETER - ETHIOPIA LINK
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cynthia Palmer | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenechukwu Leonard Osanakpo | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Selamawit Uma | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Herbert Dexter | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Penelope Jane Pullen | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Horsefield | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alma Dawn Swettenham | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.89k | £48.95k | £38.75k | £26.97k | £20.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.04k | £32.88k | £47.63k | £31.76k | £26.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.64k | £36.97k | £23.73k | £6.63k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 04 Oct 2013 as amended on 05 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF THE PEOPLE OF ETHIOPIA, IN PARTICULAR THE TOWN OF NEKEMTE, WELLEGA, AND SURROUNDING AREAS. ALSO THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN AND AROUND EXETER, DEVON, ENGLAND ABOUT ETHIOPIA AND ITS NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Westminster Avenue
CHESTER
CH4 8JB
- Phone:
- 07733103429
- Email:
- dawnsw.eel@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window