Financial history UNLIMITED OXFORDSHIRE

Charity Number: 1156718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5 £4.04k £1.43k £6.51k £5
Total expenditure £368 £664 £5.10k £721 £5.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A