EIMAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 October 2013: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KHATIJA BARDAY-WOOD BBM | Chair | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR SUSAN NOORI | Trustee | 28 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR NAHEED KAZMI | Trustee | 25 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 263 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 629 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 629 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 994 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 994 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1359 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1359 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1724 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1724 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 31 Oct 2013
Charitable objects
I FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF MUSLIM WOMEN WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC POSITION IN PARTICULAR BY: A) RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS AND PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED; B) ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY AND ACHIEVE THEIR POTENTIAL THROUGH DEVELOPING THEIR CAPACITIES AND SKILLS; C) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION; AND D) INCREASING THEIR EFFECTIVE PARTICIPATION WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY. II FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR WITH REFERENCE TO MUSLIM WOMEN, BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION OF MUSLIM WOMEN ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE OR GENDER; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND SKILLS OF MUSLIM WOMEN TO ENABLE THEM TO PLAY A MORE EQUAL ROLE IN SOCIETY; C) RAISING AWARENESS OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES; AND D) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS WITH AN EMPHASIS ON MUSLIM WOMEN III TO DEVELOP CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED WOMEN, IN PARTICULAR MUSLIM WOMEN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY BY: A) EQUIPPING PEOPLE WITH SKILLS AND COMPETENCIES WHICH THEY WOULD NOT OTHERWISE HAVE; B) REALISING EXISTING SKILLS AND DEVELOPING POTENTIAL; C) PROMOTING PEOPLE’S INCREASED SELF-CONFIDENCE; D) PROMOTING PEOPLE’S ABILITY TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR IDENTIFYING AND MEETING THEIR OWN, AND OTHER PEOPLE’S, NEEDS; AND E) IN CONSEQUENCE ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THEIR COMMUNITY AND WIDER SOCIETY IN A FULLER WAY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
214A KETTERING ROAD
NORTHAMPTON
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
NN1 4BN
- Phone:
- 07526803398
- Email:
- info@eiman.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window