Trustees NORTHANTS 4X4 RESPONSE
Charity number: 1153147

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Monteith Brown | Chair | 26 June 2014 |
|
|||||
James Robert Anthony Nicholson | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Brian Taylor | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel David Nelson | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Peter Fisher | Trustee | 06 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr Jon Fry | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Mr Mike Corfe | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.