Financial history WINLATON LIBRARY VOLUNTEERS ASSOCIATION - WLVA

Charity Number: 1153490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.33k £54.83k £44.47k £4.25k £4.30k
Total expenditure £17.42k £21.87k £6.79k £10.16k £6.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.39k £8.00k £950 N/A