BEDFORD COUNSELLING CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Affordable counselling for Bedfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
Governance
- BCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.51k | £77.87k | £39.85k | £47.23k | £45.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.13k | £54.17k | £56.81k | £61.93k | £46.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.50k | £5.20k | £5.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 5 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 25 OCT 2013 AMENDED ON 23 APR 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1)TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A COUNSELLING CENTRE FOR ADULTS IN BEDFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS; (2) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION LOW-COST COUNSELLING TO PERSONS WHO THROUGH LACK OF MEANS WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH COUNSELLING; (3) TO PROVIDE CONTINUING PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT WORKSHOPS, SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES TO THE COUNSELLORS INCLUDING TRAINEE COUNSELLORS, WHO ARE CONTRACTED AT BEDFORD COUNSELLING CENTRE AND TO THOSE PRACTISING IN OTHER ORGANISATIONS OR PRIVATELY, IN BEDFORDSHIRE OR BEYOND; (4)TO ADVANCE AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF COUNSELLING BY PROVIDING PROFESSIONAL CLINICAL SUPERVISION FOR QUALIFIED AND TRAINEE COUNSELLORS, IN ORDER TO STAY AT THE FOREFRONT OF GOOD CLINICAL AND ETHICAL PRACTICE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window